MD SB600 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 452
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the duties of the Statewide Steering Committee on Services for Adults with Sickle Cell Disease to include the provision of certain resources for detecting sickle cell disease and supporting individuals with sickle cell disease; authorizing the Maryland Department of Health to provide certain services relating to sickle cell disease in consultation with the Steering Committee; requiring the Department to provide certain services through community-based organizations to the extent practicable; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health – Sickle Cell Disease – Steering Committee and Services

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 452
2019-04-08SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-06HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2019-04-04HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-04HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-04HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-03-27HouseHearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-26HouseRereferred to Health and Government Operations
2019-03-22HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-03-21SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-03-20SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-20SenateFavorable with Amendments {734035/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-20SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-05SenateHearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback