MD SB60 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB338

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-14 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing a person to apply for preliminary approval of a permit to wear, carry, or transport a handgun without completing a certified firearms training course; and requiring the Secretary of State Police to investigate an application for preliminary approval of a handgun permit, issue preliminary approval if the applicant meets certain requirements, and revoke preliminary approval and deny a handgun permit if an applicant does not complete a firearms training course within 120 days after receipt of preliminary approval.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Safety - Handgun Permit - Preliminary Approval

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-14SenateWithdrawn by Sponsor
2023-01-26SenateHearing canceled
2023-01-16SenateHearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2023-01-11SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2022-10-26SenatePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

SB338 (Carry Over) 2022-02-25 - Referred Judiciary

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Safety5301(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety5306(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback