MD SB598 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-7)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 255
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-7)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 255
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Patuxent Institution and each local correctional facility and each correctional facility in the Division of Correction to have a written policy and procedure in place requiring that menstrual hygiene products be provided at no cost to a female inmate at certain times; requiring the Director of the Patuxent Institution and the managing official of a correctional facility to ensure that the correctional facility has a sufficient supply of menstrual hygiene products to meet the needs of the inmate population at all times; etc.
Title
Correctional Services - Inmates - Menstrual Hygiene Products
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 255 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2018-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2018-03-27 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-02 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {908075/1 Report Adopted |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Correction, Division of
Equipment
Health
Patuxent Institution
Prisoners
Public Safety
Records
Women
Correction, Division of
Equipment
Health
Patuxent Institution
Prisoners
Public Safety
Records
Women