MD SB597 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 416
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 416
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the frequency, from at least once every 5 years to every year, at which the Maryland Health Care Commission is required to adopt a State health plan; requiring the State health plan to be consistent with a certain contract; requiring, annually or on petition by any person, the Commission to assess each State health plan chapter, make a certain determination, and establish a certain priority order and timeline in a certain manner; etc.
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission - State Health Plan and Certificate of Need for Hospital Capital Expenditures
Sponsors
Sen. Delores Kelley [D] | Sen. Brian Feldman [D] | Sen. Guy Guzzone [D] | Sen. Katherine Klausmeier [D] |
Sen. Edward Reilly [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 416 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2019-04-02 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-02 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-01 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2019-03-25 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-19 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Certifications
Communications
Contracts
Data
Examinations
Health
Health Care Commission
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Hospitals
Public Information
Publications
Time
Zoning and Planning
Communications
Contracts
Data
Examinations
Health
Health Care Commission
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Hospitals
Public Information
Publications
Time
Zoning and Planning