MD SB596 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 762
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 762
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Including mead within the definition of beer for certain purposes; and assigning a certain tax rate for mead.
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Mead - Definition and Tax Rate
Sponsors
Sen. Cory McCray [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-25 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 762 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2019-03-28 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-28 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-28 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2019-03-18 | House | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-15 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation |