MD SB593 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-28 - Hearing 2/28 at 3:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-28 - Hearing 2/28 at 3:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a certain designee who may conduct a certain assessment to be certified or licensed, rather than certified and licensed; authorizing a person serving a certain term of confinement for an offense relating to volume dealing in cocaine base imposed on or before September 30, 2017, to file a motion to modify or reduce the sentence under certain circumstances; altering the membership of the Justice Reinvestment Oversight Board; etc.
Title
Justice Reinvestment Act - Modifications
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-28 | Senate | Hearing 2/28 at 3:00 p.m. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Criminal Law - Procedure
Expungement
Licenses
Penalties and Sentences
Petitions
Prisoners
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Criminal Law - Procedure
Expungement
Licenses
Penalties and Sentences
Petitions
Prisoners