MD SB593 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-07 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-07 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Governor annually to proclaim November as American Indian Heritage Month; and requiring the proclamation to urge educational and cultural organizations to observe the month with appropriate programs, ceremonies, and activities.
Title
State Government - Commemorative Months - American Indian Heritage Month
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {104536/1 Report Adopted |
2014-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |