MD SB593 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing specified health occupations boards within the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to establish an electronic system to distribute specified licenses, permits, certifications, or registrations; requiring specified boards to discontinue sending by first-class mail specified renewal notices and a renewed license, permit, certificate, or registration; requiring specified boards to continue to send by first-class mail specified renewal notices, licenses, permits, certifications, or registrations; etc.
Title
Health Occupations Boards - License Renewal, Investigation of Alleged Violations, and Immunity from Liability
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-06 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2013-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (140-0) |
2013-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments {396785/1 Report Adopted |
2013-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2013-04-03 | House | Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-21 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {704732/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Acupuncturists
Audiologists and Speech Pathologists
Child Care
Chiropractors
Committees and Commissions
Counselors
Dentists
Dietitians and Nutritionists
Disclosure
Electrologists
Electronic Government
Environmental Health
Health Occupations
Hearing Aids
Investigations and Inquiries
Juvenile Facilities
Liability
Licenses
Massage
Morticians
Notices
Nursing Homes
Occupational Therapists
Optometrists
Physical Therapists
Podiatrists
Postal Service
Registration
Social Workers
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Audiologists and Speech Pathologists
Child Care
Chiropractors
Committees and Commissions
Counselors
Dentists
Dietitians and Nutritionists
Disclosure
Electrologists
Electronic Government
Environmental Health
Health Occupations
Hearing Aids
Investigations and Inquiries
Juvenile Facilities
Liability
Licenses
Massage
Morticians
Notices
Nursing Homes
Occupational Therapists
Optometrists
Physical Therapists
Podiatrists
Postal Service
Registration
Social Workers
Telecommunications and Information Technology