MD SB593 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-22 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-22 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing that for specified provisions of law relating to assault, reckless endangerment, the abuse of vulnerable adults, and domestic violence, the definition of "serious physical injury" includes strangulation and suffocation.
Title
Crimes - Definition of Serious Physical Injury - Strangulation and Suffocation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-22 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-19 | First Reading Judiciary | |
2011-03-18 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2011-03-16 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-16 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-15 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2011-02-09 | Hearing 3/3 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-04 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |