MD SB586 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-28 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 685
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-28 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 685
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to submit a report, justifying the closure, to the Governor and specified legislative committees before a regional institute for children and adolescents may be closed; requiring the report to address specified items; and requiring the committees to have 60 days to review and comment on the report.
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Regional Institutes for Children and Adolescents - Report Before Closure
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-2) (Y: 132 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-04-03 - House - House Floor - Motion Special Order until next session (Carozza) Rejected (46-83) (Y: 46 N: 83 NV: 9 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-03 - House - House Floor - Motion Special Order until next session (Carozza) Rejected (46-83) (Y: 46 N: 83 NV: 9 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-28 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 685 |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2016-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-2) |
2016-04-09 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-09 | House | Motion Special Order until next session (Delegate Carozza) Rejected (46-83) |
2016-04-09 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-09 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2016-03-31 | House | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-10 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Community Facilities and Services
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Juvenile Causes
Minors
Prices
Reports
Rules and Regulations
State Employees
State Hospitals
Work, Labor and Employment
Youth
Committees and Commissions
Community Facilities and Services
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Juvenile Causes
Minors
Prices
Reports
Rules and Regulations
State Employees
State Hospitals
Work, Labor and Employment
Youth