MD SB585 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB478
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-16 - Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Hester) Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-16 - Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Hester) Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the composition of the Career and Technical Education Committee; altering the Committee's duties and authorized actions to include the perspective of career colleges and skilled trade organizations; and requiring the Committee to develop and provide to guidance counselors and public schools in the State a list of all skilled trade organization programs and career school programs in the State.
Title
Career and Technical Education Committee - Alterations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-16 | Senate | Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Hester) Adopted |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Favorable |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Favorable |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |
Same As/Similar To
HB143 (Crossfiled) 2023-01-27 - Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
SB478 (Carry Over) 2022-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
SB478 (Carry Over) 2022-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Continuing Education
Counselors
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Higher Education
Industry and Technology
inflation
Job Training
Loans
Minorities
Public Schools
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Tuition
Work, Labor, and Employment
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Continuing Education
Counselors
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Higher Education
Industry and Technology
inflation
Job Training
Loans
Minorities
Public Schools
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Tuition
Work, Labor, and Employment