MD SB584 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 701
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 701
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the circumstances under which a health care provider may disclose a medical record developed primarily in connection with mental health services; authorizing a health care provider to disclose directory information about a patient to a specified individual except under specified circumstances; requiring a health care provider to inform a patient of health care information that the health care provider may include in a specified directory and the persons to whom the information may be disclosed; etc.
Title
Medical Records - Disclosure of Directory Information and Medical Records
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Rosapepe [D] | Sen. John Astle [D] | Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Sen. Brian Feldman [D] |
Sen. Katherine Klausmeier [D] | Sen. Jim Mathias [D] | Sen. Thomas Middleton [D] | Sen. Nathaniel Oaks [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 701 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2017-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (140-0) |
2017-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments {566482/1 Report Adopted |
2017-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments {566482/1 |
2017-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2017-03-21 | House | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-10 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {257078/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Disclosure
Emergency Medical Services
Health
Health Insurance
Health Occupations
Mental and Behavioral Health
Patients
Privacy
Public Health
Records
Emergency Medical Services
Health
Health Insurance
Health Occupations
Mental and Behavioral Health
Patients
Privacy
Public Health
Records