MD SB581 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 288
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 288
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring health maintenance organizations and entities that issue or deliver specified health insurance policies or contracts to provide, on their Web sites and in print, notice about specified benefits for mental illness, emotional disorders, drug abuse, or alcohol abuse required under State law and under the federal Mental Health Parity and Addiction Equity Act and notice that members and insureds may contact the Maryland Insurance Administration for further information; etc.
Title
Health Insurance - Federal Mental Health Parity and Addiction Equity Act - Notice and Authorization Forms
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 288 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2013-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2013-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-06 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2013-04-04 | House | Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-26 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {577673/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Consumer Protection
Disclosure
Electronic Commerce
Federal Government
Forms
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Insurance - Health
Mental Health
Notices
Postal Service
Substance Abuse
Telephones
Disclosure
Electronic Commerce
Federal Government
Forms
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Insurance - Health
Mental Health
Notices
Postal Service
Substance Abuse
Telephones