MD SB579 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 525
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 525
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting certain service agreement for maintenance, purchase, or sale of residential property from containing certain provisions; and prohibiting the recordation of service agreements prohibited under the Act.
Title
Residential Property - Service Agreements - Prohibitions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 525 |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-0) |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2023-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2023-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {823726/1 Adopted |
2023-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2023-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-20 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {583628/1 Adopted |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Reassigned to Judicial Proceedings |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB728 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-10 - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Subjects
Business Occupations and Professions
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Real Estate
Real Property
Reports
Residential Property
Time
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Real Estate
Real Property
Reports
Residential Property
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Commercial Law | 13 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 14 | 801 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 14 | 802 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 14 | 803 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 14 | 804 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 14 | 805 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 14 | 806 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 14 | 807 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 14 | 808 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 14 | 809 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |