MD SB574 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-11 - Re-referred Health and Government Operations
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-11 - Re-referred Health and Government Operations
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene, in consultation with the Maryland Department of the Environment, to convene a workgroup to examine issues including research processes, communication, research by academic institutions, and the need for annual reports relating to the investigation of potential cancer clusters in the State and potential environmental causes of cancer; requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to report findings on or before December 1, 2011; etc.
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Workgroup on Cancer Clusters and
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-27 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-11 | Re-referred Health and Government Operations | |
2011-03-28 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations | |
2011-03-27 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2011-03-26 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-26 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-28 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | |
2011-02-15 | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-15 | Hearing cancelled | |
2011-02-08 | Hearing 2/23 at 2:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-04 | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Diseases
Environmental Matters
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Medical Research
Reports
Diseases
Environmental Matters
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Medical Research
Reports