MD SB573 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 567
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 567
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Extending the termination provisions of law making sales and charges related to peer-to-peer car sharing subject to a certain sales and use tax rate; requiring the Department of Legislative Services to report to the General Assembly by December 31, 2020, on comparisons of certain taxes and fees in the State and in other states as they relate to short-term vehicle rental companies and peer-to-peer car sharing and any other information which may assist the General Assembly in determining equitable State taxation on certain services; etc.
Title
Peer–to–Peer Car Sharing – Sales Tax Sunset Extension and Study
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 39 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (Y: 126 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (Y: 126 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 567 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (39-5) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (128-3) |
2020-03-17 | House | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (126-3) |
2020-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {495369/1 Adopted |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2020-03-16 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-10 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-10 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (40-7) |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Adopted |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Substitute Committee Amendment {599039/2 Adopted |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 3/6 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Substitute Committee Amendment {599039/2 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator McCray) Adopted |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment Withdrawn |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {599039/1 |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 3/5 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {599039/1 |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator Reilly) Adopted |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {599039/1 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Hearing 2/19 at 2:00 p.m. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB841 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-16 - Referred Budget and Taxation
Subjects
Chesapeake Bay
Comptroller
Leases and Rent
Motor Vehicles
Revenue and Taxes
Ridesharing
Sales and Use Tax
Sunset
Taxes - Sales and Use
Transportation
Comptroller
Leases and Rent
Motor Vehicles
Revenue and Taxes
Ridesharing
Sales and Use Tax
Sunset
Taxes - Sales and Use
Transportation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Chapter of the Acts | 2018 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Tax - General | 11 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - General | 11 | 104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - General | 2 | 1302.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |