MD SB570 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 525
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 525
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the maximum total amount of research and development tax credits that the Department of Business and Economic Development may approve in a calendar year from $8,000,000 to $9,000,000; and applying the Act to tax credits certified after December 15, 2013.
Title
Income Tax Credit - Qualified Research and Development Expenses - Credit Amounts
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy King [D] | Sen. Brian Feldman [D] | Sen. Verna Jones-Rodwell [D] | Sen. Edward Kasemeyer [D] |
Sen. Roger Manno [D] | Sen. Douglas Peters [D] | Sen. James Robey [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (98-36) (Y: 98 N: 36 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 525 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendment |
2014-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (98-36) |
2014-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments {845467/1 Report Adopted |
2014-04-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2014-03-25 | House | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-18 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-29 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Business and Economic Development, Department of
Corporations
Economic and Community Development
Income Tax
Industry and Technology
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Corporations
Economic and Community Development
Income Tax
Industry and Technology
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income