MD SB57 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-12-28 - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a court, in a custody or visitation proceeding, to deny custody or visitation rights to a certain party if the court has reasonable ground to believe that a child has been abused or neglected by the party, unless the court specifically finds that there is no likelihood of further child abuse or neglect by the party and states the reasons for the finding; authorizing the court to approve a supervised visitation arrangement under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Family Law – Child Custody and Visitation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-28SenateHearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-01-13SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2020-10-02SenatePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

HB748 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-31 - Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Family Law9101(n/a)See Bill Text
Family Law9101.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Family Law9105(n/a)See Bill Text
Family Law9109(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback