MD SB57 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 121
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 121
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the State's Attorney for Dorchester County to appoint criminal investigators, subject to the approval of the Dorchester County Council; authorizing the State's Attorney for Dorchester County to designate a chief investigator and assign other ranks and titles to other criminal investigators; providing that a criminal investigator who is appointed under the Act shall serve at the pleasure of the State's Attorney for Dorchester County; etc.
Title
Office of the State's Attorney - Dorchester County - Authority to Appoint Criminal Investigators
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 121 |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2014-04-02 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-02 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-02 | House | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters |
2014-04-01 | House | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-20 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m. |
2014-01-08 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2013-11-07 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Arrests
Courts and Court Personnel - Local
Criminal Law - Procedure
Dorchester County
Guns
Identification
Investigations and Inquiries
Job Training
Jurisdiction
Law Enforcement
Oaths
Public Employees
State's Attorneys
Subpoenas
Summonses
Weapons
Courts and Court Personnel - Local
Criminal Law - Procedure
Dorchester County
Guns
Identification
Investigations and Inquiries
Job Training
Jurisdiction
Law Enforcement
Oaths
Public Employees
State's Attorneys
Subpoenas
Summonses
Weapons