MD SB566 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 30 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering a certain provision of law limiting the amount of a finder's fee that may be charged by a mortgage broker obtaining a mortgage loan with respect to the same property more than once within a 24-month period.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Credit Regulation - Mortgage Brokers - Finder's Fee

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-30SenateReturned Passed
2018-03-29HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2018-03-28HouseSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-28HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-28HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2018-03-20HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters
2018-03-19SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2018-03-16SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-16SenateFavorable with Amendments {877677/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-16SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2018-02-22SenateHearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-31SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback