MD SB565 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the calculation of the annual interest rate that the Comptroller sets for tax deficiencies and refunds to be 3 percentage points above the average prime rate of interest quoted by commercial banks to large businesses during the State's previous fiscal year; etc.
Title
Interest Rate on Tax Deficiencies and Refunds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | House | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-09 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {159332/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |