MD SB565 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the offenses for which a person can be required to register on a specified registry; and providing for the retroactive application of the Act to all persons convicted of kidnapping under a specified section of the Criminal Law Article who have been required to register on the State Sex Offender Registry since the enactment of specified Acts of the General Assembly.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Sex Offender Registration Requirements - Kidnapping
Sponsors
Sen. Jennie Forehand [D] | Sen. Brian Frosh [D] | Sen. Lisa Gladden [D] | Sen. Thomas Miller [D] |
Sen. Jamin Raskin [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-03-29 | Third Reading Passed (132-4) | |
2012-03-27 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-27 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-03-30 | Favorable Report by Judiciary | |
2012-03-21 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-18 | First Reading Judiciary | |
2012-03-29 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-18 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-03-16 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-16 | Favorable with Amendments 108170/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-19 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2012-02-08 | Hearing 3/7 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-03 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |