MD SB564 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Decreasing from 1,380 to 1,200 the number of hours of training in a cosmetology school that a certain applicant for a cosmetology license must complete before the applicant may take a certain written examination; requiring cosmetology schools to administer a certain part of an examination to certain students; and requiring the State Board of Cosmetologists to adopt regulations to require cosmetology schools to administer a certain part of an examination and to provide the opportunity for certain remedial training to certain students.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cosmetologist - Licensing Examination - Requirements

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11SenateUnfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
2019-02-06SenateHearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-06SenateHearing canceled
2019-02-06SenateHearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-06SenateHearing canceled
2019-02-05SenateHearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback