MD SB562 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-02 - Hearing 4/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-02 - Hearing 4/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Workgroup to Study the Salary of the Sheriff of Frederick County to study the salaries of the sheriff in each county in the State and any other law enforcement position with similar responsibilities and preparation requirements as a sheriff and make recommendations regarding the salary of the Sheriff of Frederick County; and requiring the Workgroup to report its findings and recommendations to the Frederick County Delegation to the General Assembly on or before December 15, 2025.
Title
Sheriff of Frederick County - Salary - Workgroup
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | House | Hearing 4/02 at 2:00 p.m. |
2024-04-02 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-04-02 | House | Hearing 4/02 at 1:30 p.m. |
2024-04-02 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-03-26 | House | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-15 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-25 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB578 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-25 - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Courts and Court Personnel - Local
Frederick County
Reports
Salaries and Compensation
Sheriffs
Sunset
Courts and Court Personnel - Local
Frederick County
Reports
Salaries and Compensation
Sheriffs
Sunset