MD SB562 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that failure to name any trustee in a deed of trust does not have any effect on an instrument under specified circumstances; clarifying that a mortgage or deed of trust may authorize the sale of property or declare a borrower's assent to the passing of a decree for the sale of the property under specified circumstances; clarifying that a power of sale or assent may be exercised only by an individual; etc.
Title
Real Property - Mortgages and Deeds of Trust - Authority to Exercise a Power of
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-03 | Third Reading Passed (139-0) | |
2010-04-02 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-02 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-09 | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters | |
2010-03-30 | Hearing 4/8 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-19 | First Reading Environmental Matters | |
2010-04-06 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-18 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-16 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-15 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2010-02-10 | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-04 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |