MD SB560 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-11)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the eligibility of certain sources of energy for the creation of credits under the renewable energy portfolio standard; removing certain sources from the definition of a "Tier 1 renewable source"; providing that existing obligations or contract rights may not be impaired by the Act; and applying the Act to all renewable energy portfolio standard compliance years beginning after December 31, 2020.
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Eligible Sources
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB438 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-24 - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities | 7 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 7 | 704 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0560?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/sb/sb0560f.pdf |