MD SB557 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 287
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 287
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the circumstances under which a health care provider is required to disclose a medical record without the authorization of a person in interest; altering a specified notice that must be sent to specified parties in order to require a health care provider to disclose a medical record under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Medical Records - Disclosure in Response to Compulsory Process
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 287 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2013-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2013-04-08 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-08 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-06 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2013-04-02 | House | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-22 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {328772/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Attorneys
Civil Actions and Procedures
Courts
Disclosure
Guardians
Health
Health Occupations
Judges
Notices
Patients
Postal Service
Public Health
Records
State's Attorneys
Subpoenas
Summonses
Civil Actions and Procedures
Courts
Disclosure
Guardians
Health
Health Occupations
Judges
Notices
Patients
Postal Service
Public Health
Records
State's Attorneys
Subpoenas
Summonses