MD SB556 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring specified facilities to provide clinical, direct care, and other staff with regular patient interaction training in trauma- informed care and to conform with trauma-informed care principles under specified circumstances; requiring specified individuals to report specified abuse under specified circumstances; requiring State facilities to report complaints of sexual abuse or sexual harassment to the State designated protection and advocacy system; requiring the Mental Hygiene Administration to implement a pilot program; etc.
Title
Mental Hygiene Administration - Facilities - Trauma-Informed Care
Sponsors
Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Sen. Jennie Forehand [D] | Sen. Nancy Jacobs [R] | Sen. Verna Jones-Rodwell [D] |
Sen. Delores Kelley [D] | Sen. Nancy King [D] | Sen. Catherine Pugh [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-04 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-0) | |
2011-04-04 | Special Order until later today (Delegate Hubbard) Adopted | |
2011-04-03 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-03 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-04-07 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2011-03-30 | Hearing 4/5 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-27 | First Reading Health and Government Operations | |
2011-04-05 | Passed Enrolled | |
2011-04-05 | Third Reading Passed (36-0) | |
2011-04-05 | Senate Concur - House Amendment | |
2011-03-26 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2011-03-24 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-24 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-24 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | |
2011-02-09 | Hearing 3/2 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-04 | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Assault
Committees and Commissions
Education
Harassment
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Law Enforcement
Mental Health
Patients
Reports
Safety
Sexual Offenses
State Employees
State Hospitals
Victims
Women
Assault
Committees and Commissions
Education
Harassment
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Law Enforcement
Mental Health
Patients
Reports
Safety
Sexual Offenses
State Employees
State Hospitals
Victims
Women