MD SB555 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB300
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-23 - Hearing 2/23 at 2:30 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-23 - Hearing 2/23 at 2:30 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a certain assistant State's Attorney, with knowledge of the case, to meet with a victim of sexually assaultive behavior, at the request of the victim, or the victim's representative, within 10 days after a decision to not file a charging document or to dismiss charges against an alleged suspect; requiring the assistant State's Attorney, at the meeting, to explain the justification for not filing a charging document or for dismissing the charges; and authorizing the meeting to be held in person, by phone, or by other means as requested.
Title
Criminal Procedure – Victims of Sexually Assaultive Behavior – Required Meeting
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-23 | Senate | Hearing 2/23 at 2:30 p.m. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-26 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
SB555 (Carry Over) 2021-02-23 - Hearing 2/23 at 2:30 p.m.
HB270 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-18 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
HB270 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-18 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Procedure | 11 | 1009 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0555?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0555f.pdf |