MD SB554 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 5 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the county executive or any governing body of a county, after consultation with the State Board of Massage Therapy Examiners, to adopt certain ordinances or regulations relating to massage establishments; authorizing local health officers and local law enforcement to carry out certain provisions of law; authorizing law enforcement officers to demand proof of licensure or registration; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Board of Massage Therapy Examiners - Massage Therapists - Authority to Regulate

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (128-9) (Y: 128 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-05SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-03HouseThird Reading Passed (128-9)
2019-04-02HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-02HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-01HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-03-16HouseHearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-11HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations
2019-03-08SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-03-06SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-06SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-04SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-05SenateHearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback