MD SB551 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting an employer from taking adverse action against an employee who makes a complaint, brings an action, or testifies in an action under the Maryland Wage and Hour Law; specifying that the adverse action prohibited includes discharge, demotion, threat of discharge or demotion, and other specified retaliatory actions; prohibiting the conviction of an employer without specified evidence; etc.
Title
Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Prohibited Acts of Employers - Adverse Action
Sponsors
Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Sen. Verna Jones-Rodwell [D] | Sen. Delores Kelley [D] | Sen. Richard Madaleno [D] |
Sen. Roger Manno [D] | Sen. Karen Montgomery [D] | Sen. Catherine Pugh [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 88 N: 47 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 34 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 34 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-09 | Third Reading Passed (88-47) | |
2011-04-08 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-04-08 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-11 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2011-03-27 | First Reading Economic Matters | |
2011-04-08 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-26 | Third Reading Passed (34-12) | |
2011-03-25 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-25 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-25 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | |
2011-02-09 | Hearing 3/3 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-04 | First Reading Finance |