MD SB55 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB433

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 808
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution to establish that, beginning on January 1, 2024, a person is eligible to serve as a Senator or Delegate if the person has maintained a primary place of abode for 6 months preceding the date of the election in the district that the person has been chosen to represent; and submitting the amendment to the qualified voters of the State for their adoption or rejection.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Legislative Department - Eligibility to Serve as Senators and Delegates - Place of Abode

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (Y: 132 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-30SenateAssigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 808
2021-04-12SenatePassed Enrolled
2021-04-12SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2021-04-12SenateSenate Concurs House Amendments
2021-04-12HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2021-04-12HouseMotion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (132-7)
2021-04-12HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-04-12HouseFavorable with Amendments {643628/1 Adopted
2021-04-12HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
2021-04-12HouseHearing 4/12 at 4:30 p.m.
2021-04-09HouseReferred Rules and Executive Nominations
2021-04-09SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2021-04-08SenateSecond Reading Passed
2021-04-08SenateFavorable Adopted
2021-04-08SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-01-19SenateHearing 2/04 at 11:00 a.m.
2021-01-13SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-10-14SenatePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

SB433 (Carry Over) 2020-02-05 - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
III - Legislative Department9(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0055?ys=2021RS
Texthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0055f.pdf
Texthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0055t.pdf
Texthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0055e.pdf
Texthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/Chapters_noln/CH_808_sb0055e.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/amds/bil_0005/sb0055_64362801.pdf
Supplementhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes_comm/sb0055_ehe.pdf
Supplementhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes_comm/sb0055_hru.pdf
Roll Callhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/Senate/1080.pdf
Roll Callhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/1480.pdf
Roll Callhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/1481.pdf
Roll Callhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/Senate/1271.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback