MD SB55 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-13 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-13 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing that specified employers are not liable for negligently hiring or failing to adequately supervise an employee based on evidence that the employee has received probation before judgment for an offense or has been convicted of an offense under specified circumstances; providing that the Act does not limit or abrogate specified other immunities or defenses; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Title
Employers of Ex-Offenders - Liability for Negligent Hiring or Inadequate Supervision - Immunity
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-11 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2016-09-12 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Civil Actions and Procedures
Ex-Offenders
Liability
Negligence
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Work, Labor and Employment
Ex-Offenders
Liability
Negligence
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Work, Labor and Employment