MD SB55 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing from 1 to 3 the number of alternate members of the property tax assessment appeal boards for Anne Arundel County, Baltimore City, Baltimore County, Montgomery County, and Prince George's County.
Title
Property Tax Assessment Appeal Boards - Membership
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-12 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-03 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | |
2011-04-02 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-04-02 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-06 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | |
2011-03-23 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-09 | First Reading Ways and Means | |
2011-04-04 | Returned Passed | |
2011-02-08 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2011-02-04 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-02-04 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-02-03 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2011-01-19 | Hearing 2/2 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-01-18 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Anne Arundel County
Assessment Appeal Boards
Baltimore City
Baltimore County
Montgomery County
Prince George's County
Property Tax
Assessment Appeal Boards
Baltimore City
Baltimore County
Montgomery County
Prince George's County
Property Tax