MD SB55 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the membership of the Maryland Military Installation Council; altering the length and spacing of the terms of specified Council members; repealing a requirement that the Council issue a final report to the Governor and the General Assembly; and repealing the termination date of specified provisions of law related to the Council.
Title
Business and Economic Development - Maryland Military Installation Council -
Sponsors
Sen. Economic [?] |
Roll Calls
2010-01-28 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-03-29 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | |
2010-03-28 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-28 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-02 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2010-03-03 | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-29 | First Reading Economic Matters | |
2010-04-02 | Returned Passed | |
2010-01-28 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-01-26 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-01-26 | Floor Committee Amendment (Finance) Adopted | |
2010-01-26 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-01-25 | Favorable Report by Finance | |
2010-01-07 | Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-07 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-01-06 | Hearing 1/21 at 2:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-13 | First Reading Finance | |
2009-10-01 | Pre-filed |