MD SB549 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-06 - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Allowing an individual to claim a credit against the State income tax for certain allowable union dues paid by the individual during the taxable year if the union dues would have been allowed as a deduction under the Internal Revenue Code for a taxable year beginning after December 31, 2016, but before January 1, 2018; providing for the calculation of the credit; making the credit refundable; defining "allowable union dues"; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2018, but before January 1, 2026; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income Tax Credit - Agency Shop Fees and Union Dues

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-06SenateHearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback