MD SB549 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 443
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the required contents of a certain delegation agreement in order for a primary supervising physician to delegate to a certain physician assistant the dispensing of certain substances, drugs, and devices; prohibiting a primary supervising physician from delegating the dispensing of certain controlled dangerous substances identified as Schedule I; authorizing a physician assistant, under certain circumstances, to personally prepare and dispense a drug that the assistant is authorized to prescribe; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Occupations - Physician Assistants - Dispensing of Drugs Under a Delegation Agreement

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (40-0) (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 443
2018-04-06SenateReturned Passed
2018-04-05HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2018-03-30HouseSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-30HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-30HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2018-03-28HouseHearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-26HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations
2018-02-23SenateThird Reading Passed (40-0)
2018-02-21SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-02-21SenateFavorable with Amendments {784038/1 Report Adopted
2018-02-19SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-02-15SenateHearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-31SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback