MD SB548 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a provision of law providing that a health officer serves at the pleasure of the Secretary of Health and the governing body of the county; establishing notice and hearing requirements related to a removal of a health officer from office; and prohibiting a health officer who appeals a certain decision of the Secretary from carrying out the duties of health officer while the appeal is pending.
Title
Local Health Officers - Removal - Process
Sponsors
Sen. Clarence Lam [D] | Sen. Pamela Beidle [D] | Sen. Brian Feldman [D] | Sen. Shelly Hettleman [D] |
Sen. Delores Kelley [D] | Sen. Charles Sydnor [D] | Sen. Mary Washington [D] | Sen. Ronald Young [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 85 N: 39 NV: 6 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 39 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 39 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2022-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (85-39) |
2022-04-01 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-01 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2022-04-01 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2022-03-23 | House | Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-03-22 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (39-8) |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Floor Amendment {913424/1 (Senator Lam) Adopted |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {443620/1 Adopted |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Lam) Adopted |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {443620/1 |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Cassilly) Adopted |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {443620/1 |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Reassigned to Finance |
2022-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB609 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-09 - Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/8/2022) - Chapter 53
Subjects
Ethics
Governor
Health
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Hearings
Notices
Public Health
Public Officials
Work, Labor, and Employment
Governor
Health
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Hearings
Notices
Public Health
Public Officials
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 3 | 302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Personnel and Pensions | 11 | 305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |