MD SB547 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB287
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-28 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-28 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the prohibition on an individual from knowingly transferring or attempting to transfer the human immunodeficiency virus to another individual.
Title
Public Health - Prohibition on Transfer of Human Immunodeficiency Virus - Repeal
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-28 | Senate | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
SB547 (Carry Over) 2022-02-28 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 18 | 601.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |