MD SB547 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-29 - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-29 - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring an authority, to the maximum extent practicable, to provide access to public housing for ex-offenders; requiring an authority to avoid denying the eligibility of an individual based on an arrest or criminal charge that did not result in a conviction, or, under specified circumstances, a misdemeanor or felony conviction; and requiring an authority to develop specified guidance regarding eligibility for tenants with a criminal history.
Title
Ex-Offenders Recidivism Reduction Act
Sponsors
Sen. Catherine Pugh [D] | Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Sen. Joan Conway [D] | Sen. William Ferguson [D] |
Sen. Susan Lee [D] | Sen. Shirley Nathan-Pulliam [D] | Sen. Jim Rosapepe [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-21 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {314532/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Crimes and Punishments
Economic and Community Development
Ex-Offenders
Housing
Landlord and Tenant
Public Information
Safety
Crimes and Punishments
Economic and Community Development
Ex-Offenders
Housing
Landlord and Tenant
Public Information
Safety