MD SB547 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-25 - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-25 - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Treasurer, when deciding whether to designate or make an agreement with a financial institution to provide specified banking services to the State or an agency of the State, to consider whether the financial institution is incorporated under the laws of the State or is operating in the State with specified total assets.
Title
State Procurement - Banking Services Preference - Lend Local Act of 2011
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Garagiola [D] | Sen. Nancy King [D] | Sen. Roger Manno [D] | Sen. Jim Mathias [D] |
Sen. Thomas Middleton [D] | Sen. Karen Montgomery [D] | Sen. Victor Ramirez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-25 | Unfavorable Report by Finance | |
2011-02-25 | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-25 | Hearing cancelled | |
2011-02-09 | Hearing 3/1 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-04 | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2011rs/billfile/SB0547.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2011rs/bills/sb/sb0547f.pdf |