MD SB543 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-20 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-20 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Task Force on Procurement and Cybersecurity; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to conduct a study and make recommendations regarding specified law, policies, procedures, and best practices that should be adopted by the State; requiring the Task Force to submit its recommendations to the Governor and specified committees of the General Assembly on or before July 1, 2018; etc.
Title
Task Force on Procurement and Cybersecurity
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Lee [D] | Sen. Brian Feldman [D] | Sen. Guy Guzzone [D] | Sen. Karen Montgomery [D] |
Sen. Victor Ramirez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-20 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance) |
2015-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Finance and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Attorney General
Committees and Commissions
Electronic Government
Procurement
Reports
Safety
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Government - Procurement
Sunset
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Committees and Commissions
Electronic Government
Procurement
Reports
Safety
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Government - Procurement
Sunset
Telecommunications and Information Technology