MD SB541 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 38
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 38
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City to grant, by law, a property tax credit against the personal property tax imposed on personal property of a supermarket that completes specified construction and is located in a specified food desert retail incentive area; requiring the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City to designate what constitutes a food desert retail incentive area for purposes of the tax credit; applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2015; etc.
Title
Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit - Supermarkets
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-14 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 38 |
2015-04-03 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2015-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2015-04-01 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-01 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-01 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2015-03-25 | House | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-18 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {979532/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Baltimore City
Commerce and Business
Construction
Food
Laws and Ordinances
Personal Property
Property Tax
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property - Local
Commerce and Business
Construction
Food
Laws and Ordinances
Personal Property
Property Tax
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property - Local