MD SB535 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-14)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-30 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-30 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Highway Administration to dedicate a specified portion of highway in Baltimore County as the Senator Norman R. Stone, Jr. Highway.
Title
Highway Dedication - Senator Norman R. Stone, Jr. Highway
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-07 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Special Order until 3/6 (Senator Jennings) Adopted |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | First Reading Finance |