MD SB535 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering from 10 to 15 the number of days' advance notice the County Commissioners of Carroll County must give to an owner or occupant of property before removing a specified nuisance or menace; authorizing a property owner or occupant to file an appeal of a specified determination that a nuisance or menace exists to a specified hearing officer or board of appeals within 10 business days after receiving notice of the determination under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Carroll County - Abatement of Nuisances
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) | |
2011-04-05 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | |
2011-04-04 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-04-04 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-08 | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters | |
2011-03-30 | Hearing 4/7 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-20 | First Reading Environmental Matters | |
2011-04-06 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-22 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2011-03-18 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-18 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-03-17 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-02-16 | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-04 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Agriculture
Appeals
Carroll County
County Commissioners
Farmland
Health
Hearings
Notices
Nuisances
Real Property
Safety
Weeds
Appeals
Carroll County
County Commissioners
Farmland
Health
Hearings
Notices
Nuisances
Real Property
Safety
Weeds