MD SB530 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-11 - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-11 - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt not to exceed $500,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Board of Directors of Audubon Maryland-DC, Inc. for the planning, design, construction, repair, renovation, reconstruction, and capital equipping of the Patterson Park Audubon Center, located in Baltimore City; providing for disbursement of the loan proceeds, subject to a requirement that the grantee provide and expend a matching fund; etc.
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Patterson Park Audubon Center
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-11 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation Withdrawn |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2013-03-09 | Senate | Hearing 3/09 at 10:00 a.m. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |