MD SB53 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 134
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 134
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that the Department of General Services is responsible for monitoring the status of certain energy performance contracts and reporting on that status to the Board of Public Works annually; requiring a primary procurement unit to consult with the Department before issuing a request for proposals for an energy performance contract; requiring the Department to review certain proposed requests for proposals for energy performance contracts; etc.
Title
State Finance and Procurement - Energy Performance Contracts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (130-0) (Y: 131 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 134 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-03-25 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-0) |
2019-03-22 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-22 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-21 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2019-03-12 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-08 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m. |
2019-01-09 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2018-11-08 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Contracts
Data
Energy
Energy Matters
General Services, Department of
Procurement
Reports
State Government - Procurement
Sunset
Data
Energy
Energy Matters
General Services, Department of
Procurement
Reports
State Government - Procurement
Sunset