MD SB526 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-27 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-27 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City to grant, by law, a property tax credit against the property tax imposed on specified rental dwellings in Baltimore City; establishing that qualified landlords that provide specified rental discounts to specified public safety officers may be eligible for the tax credit; providing that, for a taxable year, qualified landlords, who receive a credit under the Act are ineligible to receive specified other credits against the county property tax in that taxable year; etc.
Title
Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit - Rental Discount for Baltimore City Public Safety Officers
Sponsors
Sen. William Ferguson [D] | Sen. Joan Conway [D] | Sen. Nathaniel McFadden [D] | Sen. Shirley Nathan-Pulliam [D] |
Sen. Barbara Robinson [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {199039/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Baltimore City
Landlord and Tenant
Law Enforcement
Leases and Rent
Property Tax
Sunset
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property - Local
Landlord and Tenant
Law Enforcement
Leases and Rent
Property Tax
Sunset
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property - Local