MD SB525 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-01 - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-01 - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring an agency that is participating in a child abuse or neglect investigation and that has reasonable grounds to believe that a person has failed to report child abuse as required under a specified provision of law to file a specified complaint with a specified board, agency, institution, or facility.
Title
Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report
Sponsors
Sen. Jamin Raskin [D] | Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Sen. Michael Hough [R] | Sen. Nancy King [D] |
Sen. Susan Lee [D] | Sen. Karen Montgomery [D] | Sen. Victor Ramirez [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-01 | House | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-16 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Child Abuse and Neglect
Disclosure
Family Law
Health Occupations
Investigations and Inquiries
Law Enforcement
Public Employees
Reports
Social Workers
State Employees
Teachers
Child Abuse and Neglect
Disclosure
Family Law
Health Occupations
Investigations and Inquiries
Law Enforcement
Public Employees
Reports
Social Workers
State Employees
Teachers