MD SB525 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-19 - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-19 - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Commission on African American History and Culture to provide operational funding to a museum that specializes in African American history and culture.
Title
Commission on African American History and Culture - Duties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-19 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-07 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-29 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Committees and Commissions
Historical Matters
Museums
State Aid
State Government - Procurement
Committees and Commissions
Historical Matters
Museums
State Aid
State Government - Procurement